U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Dervishi et al v. Werner Enterprises Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 01, 2021: [Witness List]
  • September 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • August 23, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 20, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 17, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 14, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • December 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • November 17, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • November 17, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.