U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Rennick v. BNSF Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 01, 2022: [Deposition]
  • March 01, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 21, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • February 21, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • February 21, 2022: [Proposed Verdict]
  • February 09, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 17, 2022: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Witness List]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 09, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 03, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 19, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 19, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.