U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Grice v. Badilla et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 08, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 20, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.