U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Murray et al v. Royal Truck & Equipment Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 16, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • February 15, 2021: [Strike]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 22, 2021: [Stay Case]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Status Report]
  • December 31, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 01, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.