U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Williams v. Scotts Bluff County Nebraska Sheriff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Answer to Prisoner Complaint]
  • January 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 29, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 21, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 11, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 30, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 30, 2020: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.