U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00218
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • January 05, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Appeal Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • December 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 18, 2020: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 30, 2020: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 30, 2020: [Appendix]
  • November 30, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.