U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Sherman et al v Trinity Teen Solutions Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Letter(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Report Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Supplement]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 21, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 20, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript Letter (Court Reporter Use)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 20, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - Court Reporter]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 07, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Opposition]
  • November 08, 2022: [Stay Case]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [10th Circuit Filing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 04, 2022: [Reply]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Objection]
  • September 15, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 15, 2022: [Supplement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 26, 2022: [Opposition]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 24, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 12, 2022: [Certify Class]
  • August 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 01, 2022: [Opposition]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • May 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 08, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Bifurcate]
  • January 11, 2022: [Statement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 27, 2021: [Bifurcate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • May 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 10, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Complexity]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 29, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 29, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 22, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 19, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 19, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Complexity]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 05, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2021: [Praecipe]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 22, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Payment Entry]
  • December 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.