U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Westbank Construction Inc et al v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2021: [Brief]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Brief]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • January 14, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 11, 2021: [Vacating Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 29, 2020: [Hearing - Dispositive]
  • December 28, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • December 28, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Supplemental Designation]
  • December 24, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • December 23, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • December 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • December 09, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Supplemental Designation]
  • December 09, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • December 04, 2020: [Brief]
  • December 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2020: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • December 02, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.