U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00227
  • Case Name: O'Brien v. Silsby
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 04, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • November 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • October 14, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 14, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • October 14, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Reply Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Brief]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • December 04, 2020: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.