U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Manning v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on 2255 Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Response to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.