U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. Pro Wireline Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 03, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
  • March 03, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.