U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Williams v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Supplement]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Response]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 15, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.