U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Authement v. Blazin Wings Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 16, 2020: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.