U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00240
  • Case Name: Sena v. Perea et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 13, 2022: [Response]
  • April 12, 2022: [Response]
  • April 06, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 05, 2022: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Brief]
  • February 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • February 03, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Joinder - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 22, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response]
  • January 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2022: [In Limine]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 16, 2021: [Witness List]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • October 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 18, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • October 14, 2021: [Compel]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Request for Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 16, 2021: [Disqualify]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 10, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 12, 2021: [Response]
  • February 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 15, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.