U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Halcomb v. Wyoming Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Response]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 14, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Praecipe]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.