U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Riley v. Samuel Engineering Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 19, 2022: [Errata]
  • July 19, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • July 18, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 13, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 10, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 06, 2022: [Response]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 15, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • February 14, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 07, 2021: [Opposition]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Compel]
  • November 11, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 26, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • February 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 01, 2021: [Praecipe]
December, 2020
  • December 24, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • December 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.