U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion to Revoke - SEALED/PETITION for Warrant for Offender Under Supervision]
  • July 12, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Violation Report Recommendations]
  • July 09, 2021: [Violation Memorandum]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Pending Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • July 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Revoke (Amended) - Sealed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Revoke - Sealed]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Modify the Conditions or Terms of Supervised Release with Consent of the Offender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.