U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: Swan v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • November 01, 2021: [Letter(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on 2255 Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Response]
  • July 01, 2021: [Response]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2021: [Response]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • February 16, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • February 05, 2021: [Letter(s)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Letter(s)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 08, 2021: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.