U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:10-cr-00265-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order for Compassionate Release re Section 603(b) of the First Step Act]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice of Filing Medical Records - Ex Parte]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extend]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Filing Medical Records - Ex Parte]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Reassignment]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 08, 2021: [Compassionate Release re Section 603(b) of the First Step Act of 2018]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.