U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keodouangdy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2021: [Suppress]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 02, 2021: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • February 02, 2021: [Discovery]
  • February 02, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • February 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • January 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • January 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2021: [Bond Report]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.