U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Midgett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 15, 2021: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2021: [Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Prosecutor's Statement]
  • February 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Discovery]
  • January 19, 2021: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • January 19, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.