U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Horn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [- Non Public Document]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Receipt for Passport]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • August 23, 2022: [Return of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [CJA Voucher 20]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 15, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 23, 2021: [CJA Voucher 21 or 24]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Report Revised]
  • December 08, 2021: [Presentence Report Addendum]
  • December 03, 2021: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2021: [Prosecutor's Statement]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Prosecutor's Statement]
  • October 19, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Note/Question]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Verdict]
  • October 12, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 06, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 05, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Response]
  • September 29, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 28, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 27, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 23, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 23, 2021: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • September 22, 2021: [Jury Trial]
  • September 22, 2021: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • September 22, 2021: [Jury Selection]
  • September 22, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Expert Services]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 19, 2021: [Order]
  • September 19, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 19, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Join]
  • September 14, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 14, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Cited]
  • September 14, 2021: [Join]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Uncited]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Cited]
  • September 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 06, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 03, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Join]
  • February 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Discovery]
  • January 26, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2021: [Join]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 20, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • January 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • January 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.