U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spikes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Report Revised]
  • October 03, 2022: [Presentence Report Addendum]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 02, 2022: [Forfeiture]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2022: [Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Prosecutor's Statement]
  • June 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • April 28, 2022: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: [Bond Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2022: [Temporary Detention]
  • April 25, 2022: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • April 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • April 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.