U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puga-Barrientos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Interpreter Used]
  • June 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transportation/Subsistence]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2021: [Transportation/Subsistence]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2021: [Presentence Report Addendum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • April 27, 2021: [Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Waiver of Guilty Plea/Consent]
  • March 19, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • March 19, 2021: [Interpreter Used]
  • March 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • January 22, 2021: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • January 22, 2021: [Discovery]
  • January 22, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • January 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Bond Report]
  • January 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Temporary Detention]
  • January 19, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2021: [Interpreter Used]
  • January 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • January 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 14, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • January 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.