U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Violet Neighbors v. Target Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
  • April 29, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • April 26, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • April 26, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 26, 2021: [Dismiss Party]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 07, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 07, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • March 24, 2021: [Set Aside]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 19, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • March 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2021: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • March 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Removal]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • February 22, 2021: [Complaint]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.