U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00047
  • Case Name: Dugan v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Closing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 15, 2022: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Response]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Requiring Service and Response]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • March 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • March 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.