U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 07, 2022: [Remand]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 26, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Rule 16 Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • August 19, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 18, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 25, 2021: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.