U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Knutson v. Memorial Hospital of Laramie County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • August 17, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • July 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.