U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00130
  • Case Name: Vore et al v. Black Hills Power Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 18, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 11, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 11, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 29, 2022: [Statement]
  • July 29, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 19, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • March 21, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2022: [Vacating Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 10, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • December 09, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 04, 2021: [Reply to Response]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • July 22, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 21, 2021: [Motions Referred to Magistrate]
  • July 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Service]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Joinder]
  • July 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • July 21, 2021: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • July 21, 2021: [Transmittal of State Court Record]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Removal]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • July 12, 2021: [Complaint]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Removal (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.