U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00162
  • Case Name: Leveke v. Helena Industrial Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 31, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.