U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Fairbourn v. Wyoming Department of Corrections State Penitentiary Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • February 28, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • February 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 11, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 11, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • February 11, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • February 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • February 02, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 19, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 19, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability (NOA)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Reply to Response]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2021: [Response]
  • October 04, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • October 04, 2021: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • September 14, 2021: [Recusal]
  • September 10, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.