U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20390
  • Case Name: John Ernest Brannan and Elizabeth Lavern Brannan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.