U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20412
  • Case Name: Mark Timothy Martin and Teresa Anne Garrett-Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Third)]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • November 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 05, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • November 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment - Generic]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • October 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • September 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.