U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20437
  • Case Name: Debra Ramsey and Brandon Ramsey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement of Property Sold]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • February 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Intent to Sell]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Clerks Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp) (12/14)]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Social Security Number]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.