U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00206
  • Case Name: Klein v. Jackson Lenders LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 16, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set Aside]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 10, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 10, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Entry of Default]
  • December 08, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • December 08, 2021: [Application]
  • December 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 02, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • December 02, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Expedite]
  • November 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 22, 2021: [Expedite]
  • November 16, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2021: [State Court Docket Sheet]
  • November 15, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • November 08, 2021: [Removal]
  • November 05, 2021: [Complaint]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.