U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20466
  • Case Name: Mary Ellen Hunt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2022
  • February 19, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
December, 2021
  • December 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.