U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Report Revised]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Report Addendum]
  • May 16, 2022: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Objections/Responses to Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2022: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Guilty Plea/Consent]
  • March 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Prosecutor's Statement]
  • March 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke - SEALED/PETITION for Warrant for Offender Under Supervision]
  • March 01, 2022: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • March 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Revocation of Pretrial Release/Bond - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Revoke - Sealed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 31, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 31, 2022: [Review of Detention (Bond)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Bond Memo]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 27, 2022: [Bond/Review of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order]
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • December 06, 2021: [Discovery]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 18, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.