U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Vreeland v. Shannon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Waiver of Service Issued]
  • December 08, 2021: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.