U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Wislowski v. Social Security Administration Acting Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 11, 2022: [Remand]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.