U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Berry v. Sweetwater County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Conference Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Vacating Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • September 26, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • December 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.