U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Central Valley Computer Parts Inc. v. Resource Exchange Marketing LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • June 24, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • June 10, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • June 10, 2022: [Supplement]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 25, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 22, 2022: [Opposition]
  • April 14, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 12, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 01, 2022: [Opposition]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 15, 2022: [Opposition]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 25, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Praecipe]
  • February 14, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.