U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20494
  • Case Name: Le Anna J. Eaton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • January 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.