U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Sahagen et al v. Lora et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Reply to Response]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exhibits]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response]
  • January 11, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Affidavit]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 28, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • June 06, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 08, 2022: [Dismissing Party]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • March 08, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2022: [Counterclaim]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 11, 2022: [Acceptance of Service]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 06, 2021: [Recusal]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.