U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Freeman v. Laramie County School District No 1 President
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 09, 2022: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 05, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.