U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Ria R Squared Inc v. Wyoming Catholic College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • November 14, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 01, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Service]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.