U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Ria R Squared Inc v. Tonkowich
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 28, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • January 21, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.