U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Gramercy Distressed Opportunity Fund II LP et al v. Bakhmatyuk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • October 07, 2022: [Staying Case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 07, 2022: [Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Opposition]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 03, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 03, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 02, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Response]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • July 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 30, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response]
  • March 10, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • January 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • January 27, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Complexity]
  • December 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.