U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00225
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Hilltop National Bank et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Clerk's Bill of Cost]
  • November 11, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
  • November 07, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Opposition]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 11, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • March 11, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • February 10, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Acceptance of Service]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 20, 2022: [Third Party Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 13, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.