U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 21-20511
  • Case Name: Connor Allred and Ashley Allred
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Claims]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • March 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 02, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Amended Schedules/Petition]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • January 21, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Employee Income Records]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.