U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00227
  • Case Name: McCleave v. Progressive Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Status Report Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 15, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.